U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRONIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 20, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 20, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 20, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 10, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Receipt for Passport]
  • January 04, 2023: [Waiver]
November, 2022
  • November 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.