U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KEYS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order directing action by Probation Office]
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.