U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00064
  • Case Name: KUWAIT PORTS AUTHORITY et al v. CROWELL & MORING LLP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 13, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • July 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 08, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.