U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GORDON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.