U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Distribution of Funds]
  • July 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.