U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-00487-
  • Case Name: Shelby L. Glover
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Change of Address]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Reopen Case]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Objection]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Change of Address]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Case Reassigned]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.