U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00118
  • Case Name: Robert Royce Satterfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Close Case and Discharge Trustee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account of Distribution (TDR)]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Exhibit]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration]
  • November 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice - Possible Dividends]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Notice of Possible Dividend - Asset Designation]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Service Re: Amendment To Matrix (LBR 1009-2(e))]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order for Relief]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Support Document]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Relief from Stay]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors AMENDED -Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Resignation of Interim Trustee]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.