U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAYWOOD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Probation Order]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.