U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00120-
  • Case Name: Tamica Link
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Discharge Order to Show Cause (Judge)]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule D]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule C]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule A/B]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
July, 2022
  • July 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Service - Statement re Filing Authorization]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • July 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order to File Statement Whether Case Was Authorized]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule J]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule I]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule H]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule G]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.