U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KOVACIK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.