U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOTHARP
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Dismissal of Magistrate Case by USA]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • July 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.