U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRUDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Verdict Form ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Jury Notes ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 30, 2024: [.Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Jury Deliberation]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Jury Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Standing Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.