U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOMER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Return of Passport]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.