U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00675-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TRANKLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 14, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.