U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 12, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.