U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00243-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.