U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRIOLA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Access]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.