U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MELLORS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 23, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 11, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 02, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 02, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver]
  • July 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.