U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENSON-TYREE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 20, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.