U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMIEL-WARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2025: [.Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 02, 2023: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Bond ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • December 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 02, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 01, 2022: [Redacted Indictment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.