U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPEED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Indictment]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 27, 2022: [In Limine ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Travel ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.