U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WINEGEART
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 26, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.