U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PELICE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.