U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON, SR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • August 05, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.