U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00126-
  • Case Name: 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismiss Case]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary or Stipulated Dismissal]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • August 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • August 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • August 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • August 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.