U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00125-
  • Case Name: Pathenia M Proctor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedule C]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedule A/B]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Exhibit]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending a matrix or schedules A-J)]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - File Amended Matrix Cover Sheet or Show Cause]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To File Amended Matrix With Cover Sheet Or Show Cause]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.