U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00127-
  • Case Name: Mary E. Sydnor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Support Document]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedule E/F]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se)]
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • July 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.