U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00129
  • Case Name: Karen Windsor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Order To Show Cause]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.