U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ETHRIDGE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.