U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00130-
  • Case Name: Monique Genevieve Jefferson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 (Dismissed)]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Pay Filing Fee in Full]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Show Cause]
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Prior Discharge]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Prior Discharge]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.