U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment]
  • October 02, 2024: [Reply in Support]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 14, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Add Counts]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Redacted Document]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Standing Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.