U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIRR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.