U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WOODRUFF
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 10, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.