U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00131
  • Case Name: Crystal Miles Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order For Debtor's Employer To Pay Trustee]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • November 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Consent Order]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Support Document]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Avoid Lien]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.