U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00132
  • Case Name: Tiffany Tanea Rowe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedule J]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedule J]
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • July 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order to File Required Documents]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.