U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CASTLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.