U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.