U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHITTAKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.