U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOYNER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 09, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Review]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.