U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STAPLES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Probation Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.