U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRIEDMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 25, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.