U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00265-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 08, 2023: [In Limine ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • October 28, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 27, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.