U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 05, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.