U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00138-
  • Case Name: Pamela V. Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Support Document]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order for Relief]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • October 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
August, 2022
  • August 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • August 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.