U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARGAR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.