U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOPKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • August 05, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.