U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00074
  • Case Name: CHEN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.