U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MINOR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 24, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.