U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10010-
  • Case Name: Garcia v. 819D LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appearance (Attorney)]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • September 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Remand]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice - Generic]
  • August 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • August 23, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pretrial Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (AP)]
  • August 17, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 13, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Scheduled (AP)]
  • August 09, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • August 09, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.