U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00270-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANWARING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.